Sade, Shachar (CPSO#: 80905)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Pathology
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 83869
Fax: (416) 480-4271
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

LifeLabs Medical Laboratory Service
100 International Blvd
Toronto ON  M9W 6J6
Canada
Phone: 1 877-849-3637
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shachar Sade Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 06 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sade ( CPSO# 80905 )

Business Address:
100 International Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9W 6J6
Phone Number: (877) 849-3637

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Pathology
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room E4-28b
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHACHAR SADE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SADE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 05 Nov 2007 to 30 Nov 2007
Elective Trainee - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009