Sadek, Mouhannad M (CPSO#: 82575)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Mar 2010

Summary

Former Name: Sadek, Mouhannad (used until: 28 Jun 2005 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Box 703
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8135
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sadek Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 19 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sadek ( CPSO# 82575 )

Business Address:
University of Ottawa Heart Institute
Department of Cardiology
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 761-5000

Business Address:
Box 703
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8135

Business Address:
Sudbury Regional Hospital
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5L1

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 12 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOUHANNAD M SADEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SADEK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Mar 2010