Sadoughi, Mehdi (CPSO#: 83674)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:University of Tehran, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 225
89 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 4B8
Phone: (416) 745-1597
Fax: (416) 745-2192
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sadoughi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 16 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sadoughi ( CPSO# 83674 )

Business Address:
Medical Office Building
Suite 225
89 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9V 4B8
Phone Number: (416) 745-1597

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MEHDI SADOUGHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SADOUGHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2005 to 23 Nov 2005
Assessment Verification Period - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 24 Nov 2005 to 31 Aug 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2006 to 31 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2007 to 31 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2008 to 31 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010