Sadry, Sharon Arnavaz (CPSO#: 95723)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 307
164 Queen Street East
Brampton ON  L6V 1B4
Phone: (905) 595-0456
Fax: (905) 595-1566
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Crescent Town Health Centre
4 The Market Place
Toronto ON  M4C 5M1
Canada
Phone: (416) 690-3412
Fax: (416) 691-2543
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Scarborough Centre For Healthy
Communities
Unit 2
629 Markham Road
Scarborough ON  M1H 2A4
Canada
Phone: (416) 642-9445
Fax: (866) 574-5772
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHARON ARNAVAZ SADRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SADRY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015