Saeed, Haider Ali (CPSO#: 83046)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Aug 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Albany Medical College of Union Univ, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Crown Point Family Health Centre
Hamilton Family Health Team
67 Kenilworth Avenue North, Lower
Hamilton ON  L8H 4R6
Phone: (905) 547-2302
Fax: (905) 548-9722
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Shelter Health Network
Good Shepherd Health Clinic
128 Emerald Street South
Hamilton ON  L8N 2V5
Canada
Phone: (905) 526-7137
Fax: (905) 526-7969
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Shelter Health Network
CMHA Primary Care Clinic
131 John Street South
Hamilton ON  L8N 2C3
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-0090 Ext. 256
Fax: (905) 667-5029
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Haider Saeed Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 16 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Saeed ( CPSO# 83046 )

Business Address:
67 Kenilworth Avenue North
Hamilton ON  L8H 4R6
Phone Number: (905) 547-2302

Business Address:
128 Emerald Street South
Hamilton ON  L8N 2V5
Phone Number: (905) 526-7187

Business Address:
131 John Street South
Hamilton ON  L8N 2C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-0090

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Aug 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HAIDER ALI SAEED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAEED is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2007