Saeed, Muhammad Aslam (CPSO#: 74260)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 28 Apr 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Sindhi, Urdu

Education:University of Sind, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
310 Wellington Road,South
London ON  N6C 4P4
Phone: (519) 433-4700
Fax: (519) 433-4702
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2227 South Millway
Suite 303
Mississauga ON  L5L 3R6
Canada
Phone: 15198707786
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

10886 Hurontario
Brampton ON  L7A 3R9
Canada
Phone: 15198707786
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

123 Edward Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Canada
Phone: 15198707786
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

710 Dorval Drive
Oakville ON  L6K 3V7
Canada
Phone: 15198707786
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

40 James Street South
Hamilton ON  L8P 2X8
Canada
Phone: 905-297-8434
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Suite 300
5734 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M2M 4E7
Canada
Phone: 416-222-5501
Fax: 416-222-1932
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Suite 207
3155 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3V2
Canada
Phone: 905-631-2080
Fax: 905-635-6215
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Unit 207
10 Cottrelle Blvd
Brampton ON  L6S 0E2
Canada
Phone: 905-794-4497
Fax: 905-794-7258
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Suite 206
688 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3B6
Canada
Phone: 416-463-7007
Fax: 416-463-7007
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Unit 4
45 Hannover Drive
St Catharines ON  L2W 1A3
Canada
Phone: 905-684-9999
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

6124 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8T 1E6
Canada
Phone: 519-915-9494
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Muhammad A. Saeed Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 15 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Saeed ( CPSO# 74260 )

Business Address:
310 Wellington Road South
London ON  N6C 4P4
Phone Number: (519) 433-4700

Business Address:
Dynamic Endoscopy and Speciality Care
Suite 4
45 Hannover Drive
St Catharines ON  L2W 1A3
Phone Number: (905) 684-9999

Business Address:
206-688 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3B9
Phone Number: (416) 463-7007

Business Address:
40 James Street South
Hamilton ON  L8P 2X8
Phone Number: (905) 297-8434

Business Address:
Suite 303
2227 South Millway
Mississauga ON  L5L 3R6
Phone Number: (905) 569-7056

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1999 to 31 Aug 2000
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 28 Apr 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 28 Apr 2015 Active View Details [+]
            As from April 28, 2015, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Muhammad Aslam Saeed,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Saeed to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Saeed is permitted to practise anesthesia at Level 2 out-of-hospital
                  premises only and must provide a minimum of sixty (60) days' notice to
                  the College of his intent to practise anesthesia in any hospitals or
                  Level 3 out-of-hospital premises.