Saettler, Erik Robert James (CPSO#: 76362)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 19 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 17 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Mar 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Aug 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015