Safavi, Mahsa (CPSO#: 84596)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Nov 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Nov 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Azari, English, Farsi

Education:University of Tehran, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jul 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAHSA SAFAVI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAFAVI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2008