Safieddine, Najib Nazem (CPSO#: 77567)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, Spanish

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Michael Garron Hospital
Chest Centre (G2)
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 469-2345
Fax: (416) 469-9527
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Najib Safieddine Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 26 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Safieddine ( CPSO# 77567 )
Dr. M. Haidar ( CPSO# 109160)

Business Address:
Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Chest Centre (G2)
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 469-2345

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 05 Oct 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAJIB NAZEM SAFIEDDINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAFIEDDINE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 6 - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 7 - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007