Safinia, Layla (CPSO#: 81580)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
309 Sheppard Ave East
Suite 201
Toronto ON  M2N 3B3
Phone: 647-340-7601
Fax: 647-340-7612
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

101 Humber College Blvd.
Room 060
Toronto ON  M9V 1R8
Canada
Phone: 416-747-3469
Fax: 416-747-3344
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Layla Safinia Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 15 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Safinia ( CPSO# 81580 )

Business Address:
Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Boulevard
Room 060
Toronto ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 747-3469

Business Address:
201 - 309 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2N 3B3
Phone Number: (647) 340-7601

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 May 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Neurology Effective: 26 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAYLA SAFINIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAFINIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2009