Safir, Oleg Aleksandrovich (CPSO#: 79962)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 May 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 May 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Russian

Education:Dniepropetrovsk State Medical Academy, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Division of Orthopaedic Surgery
476A - 600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4653
Fax: (647) 826-8019
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Oleg Safir Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 11 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Nesterenko ( CPSO# 89098 )
Dr. O. Safir ( CPSO# 79962 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Division of Orthopaedic Surgery
600 University Avenue
Suite 476D1
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-2554

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 01 Mar 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OLEG ALEKSANDROVICH SAFIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAFIR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 09 Sep 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 10 Sep 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 27 Jul 2005 to 26 Jan 2006
International Specialist Physician - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Jan 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 May 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Dec 2006
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 12 Dec 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 May 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 May 2008