Saha, Sandipan (CPSO#: 70404)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Streetsville Medical Centre
5425 Creditview Road
Suite 8
Mississauga ON  L5V 2P3
Phone: (905) 826-1164
Fax: (905) 826-1214
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Saha Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 15 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Saha ( CPSO# 70404 )

Business Address:
8 - 5425 Creditview Road
Mississauga ON  L5V 2P3
Phone Number: (905) 826-1164

Business Address:
175 Rutledge Road
Mississauga ON  L5M 0X7

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANDIPAN SAHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAHA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1998