Sahgal, Arjun (CPSO#: 76245)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Mar 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Mar 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Odette Cancer Centre
Head CNS Oncology
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4974
Fax: (416) 480-6002
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Sahgal & Kim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 16 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sahgal ( CPSO# 76245 )
Dr. S. Kim ( CPSO# 76234 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue T-Wing
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4834

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6013

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARJUN SAHGAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAHGAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2007