Sahi, Nidhi (CPSO#: 87726)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 28 Aug 2007 to 27 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jul 2010