Saibil, Romy Beth (CPSO#: 75090)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
548 Carlton Road
Unionville ON  L3R 0C6
Phone: (647) 746-4926
Fax: (289) 236-0235
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Russel Segal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 23 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Saibil ( CPSO# 75090 )
Dr. R. Segal ( CPSO# 68159 )

Business Address:
298 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2N 3B1
Phone Number: (416) 223-6500

Business Address:
William Osler Health System
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120


Corporation Name: Romy Saibil Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 14 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Saibil ( CPSO# 75090 )

Business Address:
548 Carlton Road
Unionville ON  L3R 0C6
Phone Number: (647) 746-4926

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROMY BETH SAIBIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAIBIL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Nov 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Dec 2001 to 31 May 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jun 2002 to 31 May 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jun 2003 to 30 Nov 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2003