Saibil, Samuel David (CPSO#: 93175)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Feb 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Medicine
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Eaton Building, Room 14-217
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 480-5744
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 22 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 27 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMUEL DAVID SAIBIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAIBIL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 22 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 23 Sep 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Dec 2018
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2017