Saidenberg, Elianna (CPSO#: 77610)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Dec 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Division of Hematology and
Transfusion Medicine
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 79077
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. D. Shmorgun Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 29 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Shmorgun ( CPSO# 77613 )
Dr. E. Saidenberg ( CPSO# 77610 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Fertility Centre
955 Green Valley Crescent
Ottawa ON  K2C 3V4
Phone Number: (613) 686-3378

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 17 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELIANNA SAIDENBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAIDENBERG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
Clinical Fellow - Transfusion Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
Clinical Fellow - Transfusion Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2009