Saini, Mukesh Chander (CPSO#: 60699)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University India, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 3
110 Pertosa Drive
Brampton ON  L6X 5E9
Phone: (905) 453-8212
Fax: (905) 453-9023
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mukesh C. Saini Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 14 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Saini ( CPSO# 60699 )

Business Address:
Unit 3
110 Pertosa Drive
Brampton ON  L6X 5E9
Phone Number: (905) 453-8212

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MUKESH CHANDER SAINI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAINI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1990