Sainsbury, Marita Lee (CPSO#: 94122)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Sydney, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 13 Aug 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 14 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011