Saint-Pierre, Mathieu Guy David (CPSO#: 96074)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jan 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hôpital Montfort, 713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Fax: (613) 748-4975
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Asclepios Clinic
570 Lacolle
Ottawa ON  K4A0N9
Canada
Phone: 6138308388 Ext. 322
Fax: 6137788655
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mathieu Saint-Pierre Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 11 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Saint-Pierre ( CPSO# 96074 )

Business Address:
Hopital Montfort
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Business Address:
570 Lacolle
Ottawa ON  K4A 0N9
Phone Number: (613) 830-8388

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 31 Oct 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATHIEU GUY DAVID SAINT-PIERRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAINT-PIERRE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2016