Saito, Simon (CPSO#: 75289)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Oct 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Oct 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Cardiac Surgery
Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 761-4708
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 11 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SIMON SAITO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAITO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 7 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 8 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 01 Sep 2004
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Sep 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 13 Sep 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 13 Sep 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2005