Sajic, Dusan (CPSO#: 93599)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 8
33 Farley Drive
Guelph ON  N1L 0B7
Phone: (519) 836 8558
Fax: (519) 822 0403
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dusan Sajic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 16 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Sajic ( CPSO# 93599 )

Business Address:
8-33 Farley Drive
Guelph ON  N1L 0B8
Phone Number: (519) 836-8558

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DUSAN SAJIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAJIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015