Sakanovic, Alenko (CPSO#: 91003)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bosnian, Croatian, English, Serbian

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Of Ottawa Division
Of Orthopaedic Surgery
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALENKO SAKANOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAKANOVIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011