Sakellarides, Michel (CPSO#: 70718)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 05 Aug 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 05 Aug 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 05 Aug 2015 Active View Details [+]
            As from August 5, 2015, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Michel Sakellarides,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Sakellarides to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Sakellarides has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in Ontario
                  effective immediately.