Sakhia, Faria (CPSO#: 93633)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jan 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Baqai Medical College, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
620 Bloor Street, Mississauga
Mississauga ON  L5A 3V9
Phone: (905) 277-1222
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Cloudcare Legacy Clinic
55 Dundas Street East
Toronto ON  M5B1C6
Canada
Phone: 4163616000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Sep 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FARIA SAKHIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAKHIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 06 May 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 07 May 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 06 May 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

McMaster University, 07 May 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2016