Sala, Alessandra (CPSO#: 77313)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jan 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jan 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Universita di Milano, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Feb 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jan 2005
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Feb 2002
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Feb 2002
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 15 May 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Apr 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Apr 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Nov 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jan 2005