Salahudeen, Shafeequr Rahman (CPSO#: 82746)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 May 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 May 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of Madras, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Marys General Hospital
Diagnostic Imaging
911 Queens Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone: (519) 749-6455
Fax: (519) 749-6513
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Salahudeen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 15 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Salahudeen ( CPSO# 82746 )

Business Address:
63 Hume Drive
Cambridge ON  N1T 1N2
Phone Number: (519) 504-7410

Business Address:
St Marys General Hospital
Diagnostic Imaging
911 Queens Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 749-6455

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 25 May 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAFEEQUR RAHMAN SALAHUDEEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALAHUDEEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 24 May 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Oct 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 May 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 May 2012