Salama, Magdy Gamil Abdou (CPSO#: 85904)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jan 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 14 Oct 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:ZAGAZIG FACULTY OF MEDICINE, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Keele and Rogers Medical Centre
605 Rogers Road D-5
Toronto ON  M6M 1B9
Phone: (416) 656-6515
Fax: (416) 656-6815
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.G. Salama Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 27 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Salama ( CPSO# 85904 )

Business Address:
Keele and Rogers Medical Centre
605 Rogers Road
Suite D-5
Toronto ON  M6M 1B9
Phone Number: (905) 656-6515

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Egypt

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2007
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Oct 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Discipline Committee Effective: 14 Oct 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Discipline Committee Effective: 14 Oct 2011 Active View Details [+]
            As from 12:00 p.m, October 14, 2011, by order of the Discipline Committee of
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms,
            conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held
            by Dr. Magdy Gamil Abdou Salama:

                  Dr. Salama shall not participate in any research studies or activities of
                  any kind at any time.

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 14 Oct 2011
Summary:

 On October 14, 2011, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Magdy Gamil Abdou Salama committed an 
 act of professional misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the 
 profession in conducting research.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1.	The 
 Registrar place the following terms, conditions and limitation on Dr. Salama(s certificate of 
 registration:

I)	Dr. Salama shall not participate in any research studies or activities of any 
 kind at any time; and
ii)	Dr. Salama shall, at his own expense, participate in and successfully 
 complete an education program in medical ethics and informed consent organized and approved by the 
 College.

2.	Dr. Salama appear before the panel to be reprimanded.

3.	Dr. Salama pay costs to the 
 College in the amount of $3,650 within thirty (30 days from the date of this Order.

4.	The 
 results of this proceeding be included in the register.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): October 14, 2011