Salamat, Amirreza (CPSO#: 88409)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jan 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jan 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:Ghazvin University of Medical Sciences, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Discovery Family Health
77 Provost Dr.
Toronto ON  M2K 0B7
Phone: (416) 901 7407
Fax: (416) 901 9780
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

All Med Health
Unit C1
16880 Yonge Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 0A3
Canada
Phone: (905) 895-9777
Fax: (905) 895-9720
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Salamat Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 01 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Salamat ( CPSO# 88409 )

Business Address:
All Med Health
16880 Yonge Street
Unit C1
Newmarket ON  L3Y 0A3
Phone Number: (905) 895-9777

Business Address:
Discovery Family Health
77 Provost Drive
Toronto ON  M2K 0B7
Phone Number: (416) 901-7407

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMIRREZA SALAMAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALAMAT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2011