Salamon, Lisa (CPSO#: 79118)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 201
955 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Maple ON  L6A 4P9
Phone: (905) 417-7899
Fax: (905) 417-8905
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lisa Salamon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 30 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Salamon ( CPSO# 79118 )

Business Address:
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2550

Business Address:
Suite 201
955 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Maple ON  L6A 4P9
Phone Number: (905) 417-7899

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 26 Oct 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LISA SALAMON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALAMON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Nov 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2005