Salasidis, Gary Chris (CPSO#: 71905)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Mar 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Greek

Education:McGill University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Mary's Regional
Cardiac Care Centre
911 Queen's Blvd
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone: (519) 749-6937
Fax: (519) 749-6492
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Salasidis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 21 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Salasidis ( CPSO# 71905 )

Business Address:
St. Mary's Regional Hospital
Cardiac Care Centre
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 744-3311

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 742-3611

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiothoracic Surgery Effective: 04 Sep 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GARY CHRIS SALASIDIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALASIDIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Aug 1998
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 1998