Saleem, Mohammad (CPSO#: 85375)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 May 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 May 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
11 Agnes Street
Kitchener ON  N2G 2E7
Phone: (519) 954-8574
Fax: (519) 954-8578
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Saleem Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 26 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Saleem ( CPSO# 85375 )

Business Address:
11 Agnes Street
Kitchener ON  N2G 2E7
Phone Number: (519) 954-8574

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 21 Apr 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD SALEEM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALEEM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Jul 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 10 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 May 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 May 2009