Saleh, David Seleman (CPSO#: 79460)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Feb 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Hotel Dieu Hospital
Department of Pediatrics
166 Brock Street - B3-002
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 544-3400 Ext. 3133
Fax: (613) 544-3559
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Timmins and District Hospital
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Canada
Phone: (705) 267-2131
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08

QHC Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Canada
Phone: (613) 969-7400 Ext. 2028
Fax: 613 961-2522
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Saleh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 18 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Saleh ( CPSO# 79460 )

Business Address:
166 Brock Street
Suite B3-002
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Business Address:
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Phone Number: (705) 267-2131

Business Address:
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 969-7400

Business Address:
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666


Corporation Name: Mahassen Ghobrial Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Saleh ( CPSO# 79460 )
Dr. M. Ghobrial ( CPSO# 23808 )

Business Address:
314 Central Park Drive
Ottawa ON  K2C 4G3
Phone Number: (613) 728-0608

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 15 May 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 23 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID SELEMAN SALEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALEH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Mar 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Apr 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2009