Saleh, Ramy Roger (CPSO#: 107776)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2018

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:American University of Beirut, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Avenue, Suite 602
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAMY ROGER SALEH shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. SALEH is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. SALEH shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SALEH is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. SALEH shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. SALEH is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. SALEH no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 25 Aug 2015 to 21 Sep 2015
Elective Trainee - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018