Saleh, Rema'a Ahmed Shehab Ahmed (CPSO#: 75809)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Kuwait University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 28 Feb 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Mar 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006