Salem, Hany Hamed Mohammed (CPSO#: 70538)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 1998