Salim, Hatem Sami (CPSO#: 96450)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Hospital
Department of Medicine
PO Box 5010
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 58132
Fax: 519-667-6591
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hatem Salim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 15 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Salim ( CPSO# 96450 )

Business Address:
LHSC University Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
E6 - 305
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
General Internal Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HATEM SAMI SALIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015