Salim, Syeeda Shahana Shabnam (CPSO#: 91504)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Gauhati Medical College, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Halton Health Care
3001 hospital gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571 Ext. 4800
Fax: (905) 845-6419
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

C A M H
80 Workman Ways
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Canada
Phone: (416) 535-8501
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Syeeda Salim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 21 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Salim ( CPSO# 91504 )

Business Address:
Oakville Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8

Business Address:
CAMH
80 Workman Way
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 02 May 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Psychiatry Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SYEEDA SHAHANA SHABNAM SALIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 29 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 30 Dec 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2012