Salimi, Cyrus (CPSO#: 78198)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Tehran, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Sep 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 01 Nov 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

McMaster University, 07 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Nov 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Apr 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014