Salineros Urzua, Matias Javier (CPSO#: 90150)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 18 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Chile, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 06 Jan 2009 to 02 Feb 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 03 Feb 2009 to 31 Jul 2009
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Aug 2015