Salloom, Fareed Mohsen Ahmed (CPSO#: 75960)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 04 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Patrice Lumumba People's Friendship Univ, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 15 Jan 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 04 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Mar 2001
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Mar 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 May 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 May 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Jun 2002