Salmasi, Ghazal (CPSO#: 86366)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Sep 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of California
San Francisco (UCSF)
505 Parnassus Avenue
MC: Box 1270
San Francisco CA  94143
United States
Phone: 8313321953

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Aug 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 18 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GHAZAL SALMASI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALMASI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2009 to 31 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2010 to 31 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2011 to 31 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Oct 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2012