Saltzman, Ilana Sara (CPSO#: 93578)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Infectious Diseases
2200 Eglinton Ave. West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905)813-4466
Fax: (905) 813-4536
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ilana Saltzman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 25 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Saltzman ( CPSO# 93578 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Infectious Diseases
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-4466

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ILANA SARA SALTZMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALTZMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014