Saluja, Inderpal Singh (CPSO#: 76061)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Feb 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
Emergency Department
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300 Ext. 4242
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Saluja Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 11 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Saluja ( CPSO# 76061 )

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
Emergency Department
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Business Address:
St. Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 744-3311

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 03 Jan 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. INDERPAL SINGH SALUJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALUJA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 2004