Salyani, Mohamed Azam (CPSO#: 66477)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Swahili, Urdu

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 10
2563 Major Mackenzie Drive
Maple ON  L6A 2E8
Phone: (905) 303-1900
Fax: (905) 303-1196
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

200 Wellington street W
Barrie ON  L4N1K9
Canada
Phone: 9053031900
Fax: 9053031196
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Suite 1
225 Speers Road
Oakville ON  L6K0J4
Canada
Phone: 9053031900
Fax: 9053031196
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Salyani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 21 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Salyani ( CPSO# 66477 )

Business Address:
200 Wellington Street
Barrie ON  L4N 1K9
Phone Number: (844) 303-1900

Business Address:
10 - 2563 Major Mackenzie Drive
Maple ON  L6A 2E8
Phone Number: (905) 303-1900

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMED AZAM SALYANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALYANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1995