Sam, Justina Joyce (CPSO#: 86675)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 403
1100 Sheppard Avenue East
North York ON  M2K 2W1
Phone: (416) 222-0660
Fax: (416) 222-9238
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

5734 Yonge St. Suite 300
Toronto ON  M2M4E7
Canada
Phone: (416) 222-5501
Fax: (416) 222-1932
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

3585 Keele St. Unit 4
Toronto, ON
M3J3H5
Toronto ON  M3J 3H5
Canada
Phone: (416) 398-2288
Fax: (416) 398-2588
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

3585 Keele St. Unit 4
Toronto, ON
M3J3H5
Toronto ON  M3J 3H5
Canada
Phone: (416) 398-2288
Fax: (416) 398-2588
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

7155 Woodbine Ave. Suite 125
Markham ON  L3R 1A3
Canada
Phone: (905) 946-0222
Fax: (905) 946-0225
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David M. Hsu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 28 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Sam ( CPSO# 86675 )
Dr. D. Hsu ( CPSO# 82650 )

Business Address:
Suite 403
1100 Sheppard Avenue East
North York ON  M2K 2W1
Phone Number: (416) 222-0660


Corporation Name: Justina J. Sam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 31 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Sam ( CPSO# 86675 )
Dr. D. Hsu ( CPSO# 82650 )

Business Address:
1100 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 403
Toronto ON  M2K 2W1
Phone Number: (416) 222-0660

Business Address:
300 - 5734 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M2M 4E7
Phone Number: (416) 222-5501

Business Address:
4 - 3585 Keele Street
Toronto ON  M3J 3H5
Phone Number: (416) 398-2288

Business Address:
North Toronto Endoscopy
7155 Woodbine Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 1A3
Phone Number: (905) 946-0222

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 04 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JUSTINA JOYCE SAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011