Samaan, Sam Faris (CPSO#: 109983)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 2016

Expiry Date:  03 Dec 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 04 Jul 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ross University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital-General Campus
Department of Nuclear Medicine
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 04 Jul 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 03 Jan 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 03 Jun 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Mar 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 03 Dec 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 07 Mar 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Sam Faris Samaan may practise nuclear medicine at The Ottawa Hospital
                  -  General Campus in Ottawa, Ontario, while under supervision coordinated
                  by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

            2.    The  certificate  of  registration  automatically  expires on December 3,
                  2018.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires  upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate  with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding  Dr.
                        Samaan's  knowledge,  skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide
                        the required reports to  the  College  by  the  due  date or if the
                        reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Samaan's practice, or
                  
                  (iii) the College finds the assessment report, pertaining to  the on-site
                        assessment of  Dr. Samaan's practice unsatisfactory.
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on July 4, 2016, and will expire on  or before
                  December 3, 2018, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.