Samanta, Sujon (CPSO#: 94634)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of London, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2010 to 10 Feb 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 11 Feb 2011 to 10 Feb 2012
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 11 Feb 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012