Samdup, Dawa Zangmo (CPSO#: 80560)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jan 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jan 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Nepali

Education:University of Madras, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hotel Dieu Hospital
KidsInclusive
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 544-3400 Ext. 3324
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dawa Samdup Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 24 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Samdup ( CPSO# 80560 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
Child Development Centre
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAWA ZANGMO SAMDUP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAMDUP is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
International Specialist Physician - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2004
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Mar 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Mar 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Jan 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 2009