Samiee Zafarghandy, Samira (CPSO#: 87078)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Oct 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Feb 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University Medical Centre
Department of Paediatrics
Division of Neonatology
1280 Main street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4L8
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 76342
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Iran

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Aug 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMIRA SAMIEE ZAFARGHANDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAMIEE ZAFARGHANDY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 23 Sep 2007 to 12 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 13 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 14 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Aug 2009 to 08 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 31 Aug 2010 to 30 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 31 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 13 Feb 2012 to 11 Mar 2012
Elective Trainee - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Sep 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2012